Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Arson

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0270 (SB0404)
Title
Criminal Law - Arson, Burning, Malicious Destruction, and Theft - Property of Another - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Crimes - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0404 (HB0270)
Title
Criminal Law - Arson, Burning, Malicious Destruction, and Theft - Property of Another - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0270 (SB0404) Criminal Law - Arson, Burning, Malicious Destruction, and Theft - Property of Another - Definition Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0457 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1046 Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0137 Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Crimes - Statute of Limitations Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0404 (HB0270) Criminal Law - Arson, Burning, Malicious Destruction, and Theft - Property of Another - Definition Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM