Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Arson

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0026
Title
Criminal Law - Arson, Burning, Malicious Destruction, and Theft - Property of Another - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050
Title
Hate Crimes - Prohibitions and Protected Classes - Expansion to Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0097
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0374 (SB0603/CH0567)
Title
Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior Crimes
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0757
Title
Criminal Law - Life Without the Possibility of Parole - First Degree Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0836
Title
Educational Institutions - Notice of Criminal Activity and Threats to Safety
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847
Title
Criminal Procedure - Crime of Violence - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Rey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0122
Title
Criminal Procedure - Reconsiderations of Sentences - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0158
Title
Criminal Law - Arson, Burning, Malicious Destruction, and Theft - Property of Another - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0216
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0603 /CH0567 (HB0374)
Title
Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior Crimes
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0026 Criminal Law - Arson, Burning, Malicious Destruction, and Theft - Property of Another - Definition Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0050 Hate Crimes - Prohibitions and Protected Classes - Expansion to Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0097 Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0374 (SB0603/CH0567) Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior Crimes Delegate Anderson 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0757 Criminal Law - Life Without the Possibility of Parole - First Degree Murder Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0836 Educational Institutions - Notice of Criminal Activity and Threats to Safety Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0847 Criminal Procedure - Crime of Violence - Definition Delegate Rey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0122 Criminal Procedure - Reconsiderations of Sentences - Reporting Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB0158 Criminal Law - Arson, Burning, Malicious Destruction, and Theft - Property of Another - Definition Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB0216 Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0603 /CH0567 (HB0374) Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior Crimes Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0656 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM