Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Assault

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0028
Title
Criminal Law - Assault - Public Transportation Operator and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0312 /CH0619
Title
Criminal Law – School Bus Driver and Public Transportation Worker – Obstructing, Hindering, or Interfering With
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0488
Title
Criminal Law - Third-Degree Assault
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0683
Title
Criminal Law - Assault of Public Transportation Operator - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0713 (SB1027)
Title
Higher Education - Transfer Student Education Records - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0913 /CH0395 (SB0607/CH0394)
Title
Higher Education – Sexual Assault Policy – Disciplinary Proceedings Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1128 (SB0736)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1305
Title
Criminal Law - Assault in the Second Degree - Educators
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1529 (SB1100)
Title
Criminal Law - Assault - Sentencing (Violence Prevention Education Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1570
Title
Criminal Law - Assault on an Elder Adult - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0607 /CH0394 (HB0913/CH0395)
Title
Higher Education – Sexual Assault Policy – Disciplinary Proceedings Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725 /CH0366
Title
Bullying, Cyberbullying, Harassment, and Intimidation – School Response
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0736 (HB1128)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Pretrial Release – Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1027 (HB0713)
Title
Higher Education - Transfer Student Education Records - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1100 (HB1529)
Title
Criminal Law - Assault - Sentencing (Violence Prevention Education Act)
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0028 Criminal Law - Assault - Public Transportation Operator and Penalties Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0312 /CH0619 Criminal Law – School Bus Driver and Public Transportation Worker – Obstructing, Hindering, or Interfering With Delegate Davis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 619
Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0488 Criminal Law - Third-Degree Assault Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0683 Criminal Law - Assault of Public Transportation Operator - Penalties Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0713 (SB1027) Higher Education - Transfer Student Education Records - Requirements Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0913 /CH0395 (SB0607/CH0394) Higher Education – Sexual Assault Policy – Disciplinary Proceedings Provisions Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Appropriations
3/01/2018 - 1:15 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1128 (SB0736) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act) Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1305 Criminal Law - Assault in the Second Degree - Educators Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1529 (SB1100) Criminal Law - Assault - Sentencing (Violence Prevention Education Act) Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1570 Criminal Law - Assault on an Elder Adult - Penalties Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0607 /CH0394 (HB0913/CH0395) Higher Education – Sexual Assault Policy – Disciplinary Proceedings Provisions Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0725 /CH0366 Bullying, Cyberbullying, Harassment, and Intimidation – School Response Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0736 (HB1128) Criminal Procedure – Pretrial Release – Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act) Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB1027 (HB0713) Higher Education - Transfer Student Education Records - Requirements Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1100 (HB1529) Criminal Law - Assault - Sentencing (Violence Prevention Education Act) Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM