Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Assault

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0894
Title
Criminal Law - Felony Second Degree Assault - Emergency Medical Care Workers
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0975 (SB0907)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1150
Title
Criminal Law - Assault on Public Transportation Operator - Penalties and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1175
Title
Public Schools - Reporting of Assaults, Crimes of Violence, and Felonies (Report Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1377 (SB0999)
Title
Criminal Law - Assault - Pregnancy (Laura and Reid's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1414 (SB0948)
Title
Criminal Law - Assault in the Second Degree - School Employee
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1422
Title
Motor Vehicles - Highway Worker Safety
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0408
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0626
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0907 (HB0975)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0948 (HB1414)
Title
Criminal Law - Assault in the Second Degree - School Employee
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0999 (HB1377)
Title
Criminal Law – Assault – Pregnancy (Laura and Reid’s Law II)
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0894 Criminal Law - Felony Second Degree Assault - Emergency Medical Care Workers Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0975 (SB0907) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1150 Criminal Law - Assault on Public Transportation Operator - Penalties and Reporting Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1175 Public Schools - Reporting of Assaults, Crimes of Violence, and Felonies (Report Act of 2019) Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1377 (SB0999) Criminal Law - Assault - Pregnancy (Laura and Reid's Law) Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1414 (SB0948) Criminal Law - Assault in the Second Degree - School Employee Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1422 Motor Vehicles - Highway Worker Safety Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0408 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act) Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0626 Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0907 (HB0975) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0948 (HB1414) Criminal Law - Assault in the Second Degree - School Employee Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0999 (HB1377) Criminal Law – Assault – Pregnancy (Laura and Reid’s Law II) Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:18 PM