Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Assault

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0074
Title
Public Safety - Crime of Violence - Witness Intimidation
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0132 (SB0205)
Title
Public Safety - Crime of Violence - Witness Intimidation
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233 (SB0212)
Title
Criminal Law – Assault in the First Degree – Strangulation
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0488 (SB0554)
Title
Crimes - Mitigation - Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0612
Title
Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Program - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0654 (SB0209)
Title
Criminal Law - Unruly Social Gatherings - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0846
Title
Public Schools - Reporting of Assaults, Crimes of Violence, and Felonies (Report Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1197
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1302
Title
Criminal Law - Felony Second-Degree Assault - Emergency Medical Care Workers
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1343
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1357
Title
Criminal Law - Felony Second-Degree Assault
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1590
Title
Criminal Law - Assault on Public Transportation Operator - Penalties and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0205 (HB0132)
Title
Public Safety - Crime of Violence - Witness Intimidation
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0209 (HB0654)
Title
Criminal Law - Unruly Social Gatherings - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0212 (HB0233)
Title
Criminal Law - Assault in the First Degree - Suffocation or Strangulation
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554 (HB0488)
Title
Crimes - Mitigation - Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691
Title
Criminal Law - Felony Second Degree Assault - Sports Official
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0942
Title
Baltimore City - Police Officers - Warrantless Arrests
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1034
Title
Criminal Law - Felony Second Degree Assault - Sports Official
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0074 Public Safety - Crime of Violence - Witness Intimidation Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0132 (SB0205) Public Safety - Crime of Violence - Witness Intimidation Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0233 (SB0212) Criminal Law – Assault in the First Degree – Strangulation Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judiciary
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0488 (SB0554) Crimes - Mitigation - Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0612 Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Program - Revisions Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0654 (SB0209) Criminal Law - Unruly Social Gatherings - Civil Penalties Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
HB0846 Public Schools - Reporting of Assaults, Crimes of Violence, and Felonies (Report Act of 2020) Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 (SB1010) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1197 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act) Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1302 Criminal Law - Felony Second-Degree Assault - Emergency Medical Care Workers Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1343 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1357 Criminal Law - Felony Second-Degree Assault Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1590 Criminal Law - Assault on Public Transportation Operator - Penalties and Reporting Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0205 (HB0132) Public Safety - Crime of Violence - Witness Intimidation Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0209 (HB0654) Criminal Law - Unruly Social Gatherings - Civil Penalties Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0212 (HB0233) Criminal Law - Assault in the First Degree - Suffocation or Strangulation Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0554 (HB0488) Crimes - Mitigation - Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0691 Criminal Law - Felony Second Degree Assault - Sports Official Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0942 Baltimore City - Police Officers - Warrantless Arrests Senator Hayes 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB1010 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1034 Criminal Law - Felony Second Degree Assault - Sports Official Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/19/2020 12:01 PM