Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Assault

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0139 (SB0626)
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0193 (SB0484)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0231 (SB0046)
Title
Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0688 (SB0028)
Title
Criminal Law - Second Degree Assault - Sports Official
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1029
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1110
Title
Criminal Law - Felony Second-Degree Assault - Emergency Medical Care Workers
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1236
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Violent Crimes Special Prosecution Unit for Baltimore City
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0028 (HB0688)
Title
Criminal Law - Second Degree Assault - Sports Official
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046 (HB0231)
Title
Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091
Title
Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Operator - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0484 (HB0193)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0626 (HB0139)
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force, Reporting, and Whistleblower Protections
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0139 (SB0626) Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0193 (SB0484) Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0231 (SB0046) Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0688 (SB0028) Criminal Law - Second Degree Assault - Sports Official Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1029 Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1110 Criminal Law - Felony Second-Degree Assault - Emergency Medical Care Workers Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1236 Office of the Attorney General - Violent Crimes Special Prosecution Unit for Baltimore City Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0028 (HB0688) Criminal Law - Second Degree Assault - Sports Official Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/20/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0046 (HB0231) Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0091 Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Operator - Penalties Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/20/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0484 (HB0193) Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0626 (HB0139) Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force, Reporting, and Whistleblower Protections Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/7/2021 1:29 PM
Click to return on the top page