Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Assessment Appeal Boards

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0510
Title
Property Tax - Assessments and Valuations of Real Property - Appeals
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0592 /CH0537 (SB0915)
Title
Real Property Tax - Assessment Appeals Process - Dwellings
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765
Title
Property Tax Assessment Appeal Board - Hearing Dates
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0915 (HB0592/CH0537)
Title
Real Property Tax - Assessment Appeals Process - Dwellings
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0510 Property Tax - Assessments and Valuations of Real Property - Appeals Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0592 /CH0537 (SB0915) Real Property Tax - Assessment Appeals Process - Dwellings Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0765 Property Tax Assessment Appeal Board - Hearing Dates Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
SB0915 (HB0592/CH0537) Real Property Tax - Assessment Appeals Process - Dwellings Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM