Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Assessments and Taxation, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235 /CH0361
Title
Property Tax - Valuation of Residential Real Property - Database
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0702 /CH0068 (SB0622/CH0067)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and Processing
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0856
Title
Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company Representative
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0888
Title
Task Force to Review Property Tax Assessment Procedures and the Assessment Appeals Process
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1140 /CH0528 (SB0697/CH0527)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Conversions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1158
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Main Street Employer Tax Rebate
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1246 (SB0469)
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0251
Title
Personal Property Tax - Depreciation of Assessed Value
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0469 (HB1246)
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0622 /CH0067 (HB0702/CH0068)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and Processing
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697 /CH0527 (HB1140/CH0528)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Conversions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1022
Title
Prince George's County - Green Business Zones
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0235 /CH0361 Property Tax - Valuation of Residential Real Property - Database Delegate McComas 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Ways and Means
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB0702 /CH0068 (SB0622/CH0067) Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and Processing Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0856 Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0881 Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company Representative Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0888 Task Force to Review Property Tax Assessment Procedures and the Assessment Appeals Process Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1140 /CH0528 (SB0697/CH0527) Corporations and Associations - Conversions Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1158 Corporate Income Tax - Main Street Employer Tax Rebate Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1246 (SB0469) Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2013 Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0251 Personal Property Tax - Depreciation of Assessed Value Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0469 (HB1246) Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2013 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0622 /CH0067 (HB0702/CH0068) Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and Processing Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0697 /CH0527 (HB1140/CH0528) Corporations and Associations - Conversions Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1022 Prince George's County - Green Business Zones Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Budget and Taxation
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM
Click to return on the top page