Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Assessments and Taxation, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161
Title
Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0312 (SB0077/CH0008)
Title
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0335
Title
Property Tax - Credits for Property in Neighborhood Conservation Area
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0480 (SB0590)
Title
Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0511 /CH0428
Title
Real Property - Residential Property - Ground Leases
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0663 (SB0179)
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940 /CH0138 (SB0774)
Title
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training Program
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0996 (SB0375)
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Application Requirement - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 /CH0008 (HB0312)
Title
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0179 (HB0663)
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0375 (HB0996)
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Application Requirement - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0507
Title
Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development Act
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0590 (HB0480)
Title
Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670
Title
Corporations and Business Entities - Filing Fees and Combined Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0698
Title
Property Tax - Valuation of Real Property - Internet Database
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774 (HB0940/CH0138)
Title
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training Program
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2015 - 3:00 PM
Rules
HB0161 Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0312 (SB0077/CH0008) Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements Chair, Economic Matters Committee 6 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0335 Property Tax - Credits for Property in Neighborhood Conservation Area Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0480 (SB0590) Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0511 /CH0428 Real Property - Residential Property - Ground Leases Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0663 (SB0179) Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2015 Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0940 /CH0138 (SB0774) Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training Program Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Economic Matters
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0996 (SB0375) Homestead Property Tax Credit - Application Requirement - Repeal Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0077 /CH0008 (HB0312) Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements Chair, Finance Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Finance
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0179 (HB0663) Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2015 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies President 6 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0375 (HB0996) Homestead Property Tax Credit - Application Requirement - Repeal Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0507 Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development Act Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0590 (HB0480) Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0670 Corporations and Business Entities - Filing Fees and Combined Reporting Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0698 Property Tax - Valuation of Real Property - Internet Database Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0774 (HB0940/CH0138) Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training Program President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM