Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Assessments and Taxation, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0034 /CH0569 (SB0331/CH0570)
Title
Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0165
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fees for Processing Articles of Dissolution, Certificates of Cancellation, and Other Documents - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0465 /CH0268
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Distribution of Recordation and Transfer Tax Revenues
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0651
Title
Montgomery County - Country Clubs and Golf Courses - Rate of Assessment and Term of Agreements MC 27-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0857
Title
Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0858
Title
Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal Property
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit Supplement
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1026
Title
Campaign Finance Reports - Business Contributors - Registration Status
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1055
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Notice of Eligibility - Lead Registry and Code Compliance
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1088 (SB0918)
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Assessments, Audits, Records, and Appeals (SDAT Reform Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163 (SB0795)
Title
Income and Property Taxes - Qualified Maryland Opportunity Zone Investments
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209 /CH0730
Title
Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1395
Title
Property Tax - Uniform Plan of Assessments - Residential Real Property
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0026 /CH0266
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Expedited Document Processing
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0059 /CH0267
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Notices and Orders - E-Mail
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331 /CH0570 (HB0034/CH0569)
Title
Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0795 (HB1163)
Title
Income and Property Taxes - Qualified Maryland Opportunity Zone Investments
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0918 (HB1088)
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Assessments, Audits, Records, and Appeals (SDAT Reform Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0034 /CH0569 (SB0331/CH0570) Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees Delegate Carr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 569
Economic Matters
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0165 Corporations and Associations - Fees for Processing Articles of Dissolution, Certificates of Cancellation, and Other Documents - Repeal Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/30/2019 - 3:00 PM
HB0465 /CH0268 State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Distribution of Recordation and Transfer Tax Revenues Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0651 Montgomery County - Country Clubs and Golf Courses - Rate of Assessment and Term of Agreements MC 27-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0857 Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0858 Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal Property Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0887 Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit Supplement Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1026 Campaign Finance Reports - Business Contributors - Registration Status Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1055 Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Notice of Eligibility - Lead Registry and Code Compliance Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1088 (SB0918) State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Assessments, Audits, Records, and Appeals (SDAT Reform Act of 2019) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1163 (SB0795) Income and Property Taxes - Qualified Maryland Opportunity Zone Investments Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1209 /CH0730 Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Ways and Means
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1395 Property Tax - Uniform Plan of Assessments - Residential Real Property Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0026 /CH0266 State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Expedited Document Processing Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0059 /CH0267 State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Notices and Orders - E-Mail Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Budget and Taxation
1/17/2019 - 10:30 AM
Ways and Means
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0331 /CH0570 (HB0034/CH0569) Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees Senator Kramer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 570
Finance
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0795 (HB1163) Income and Property Taxes - Qualified Maryland Opportunity Zone Investments Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0918 (HB1088) State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Assessments, Audits, Records, and Appeals (SDAT Reform Act of 2019) Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:18 PM