Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Assisted Living -see also- Group Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0511
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Energy for Residential Use - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1159 /CH0670
Title
Electric Companies - Service Restoration - Special Medical Needs Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267
Title
Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex Offenders
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1310 (SB0834)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1504 (SB1034)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - Baltimore City - Assisted Living on the Green
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1034 (HB1504)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - Baltimore City - Assisted Living on the Green
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0511 Sales and Use Tax - Energy for Residential Use - Exemption Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1159 /CH0670 Electric Companies - Service Restoration - Special Medical Needs Facilities Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670
Economic Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1267 Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex Offenders Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1310 (SB0834) Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1504 (SB1034) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - Baltimore City - Assisted Living on the Green Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1034 (HB1504) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - Baltimore City - Assisted Living on the Green Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM