Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Assisted Living -see also- Group Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0443 /CH0772
Title
Assisted Living Programs - Licensure Fees
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0727 (SB0644)
Title
Dental Hygienist - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentist
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1316 (SB0075)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Harford Road Assisted Living and Medical Adult Day Care Center
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0075 (HB1316)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Harford Road Assisted Living and Medical Adult Day Care Center
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532
Title
Temporary Family Health Care Structures - Permits
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0644 (HB0727)
Title
Dental Hygienist - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentist
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0443 /CH0772 Assisted Living Programs - Licensure Fees Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 772
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0727 (SB0644) Dental Hygienist - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentist Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1316 (SB0075) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Harford Road Assisted Living and Medical Adult Day Care Center Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0075 (HB1316) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Harford Road Assisted Living and Medical Adult Day Care Center Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 3:00 PM
SB0532 Temporary Family Health Care Structures - Permits Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0644 (HB0727) Dental Hygienist - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentist Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM