Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Assisted Living -see also- Group Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0258 (SB0239)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Jenkins Senior Living Community
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0375
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 /CH0439 (SB0232/CH0440)
Title
Public Health - General Hospice Care Programs - Collection and Disposal of Unused Prescription Medication
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0455 (SB0694)
Title
Assisted Living Education on Influenza
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0482
Title
Public Health - Assisted Living Programs - Educational Material on Influenza Virus
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0861
Title
Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex Offenders
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0882 (SB0798)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Winter Growth
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1505
Title
Health - Psychiatric Hospitals - Units Licensed as Assisted Living Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1790 (SB0366)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Harford Road Assisted Living and Medical Adult Day Care Center
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004 /CH0473
Title
Oversight Committee on Quality of Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0239 (HB0258)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Jenkins Senior Living Community
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0366 (HB1790)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Harford Road Assisted Living and Medical Adult Day Care Center
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0694 (HB0455)
Title
Assisted Living Education on Influenza
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0258 (SB0239) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Jenkins Senior Living Community Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 5:00 PM
HB0375 Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0407 /CH0439 (SB0232/CH0440) Public Health - General Hospice Care Programs - Collection and Disposal of Unused Prescription Medication Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0455 (SB0694) Assisted Living Education on Influenza Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0482 Public Health - Assisted Living Programs - Educational Material on Influenza Virus Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0861 Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex Offenders Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0882 (SB0798) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Winter Growth Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 5:00 PM
HB1505 Health - Psychiatric Hospitals - Units Licensed as Assisted Living Facilities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1790 (SB0366) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Harford Road Assisted Living and Medical Adult Day Care Center Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0004 /CH0473 Oversight Committee on Quality of Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities – Revisions Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Finance
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0239 (HB0258) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Jenkins Senior Living Community Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 4:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 4:00 PM
SB0366 (HB1790) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Harford Road Assisted Living and Medical Adult Day Care Center Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0694 (HB0455) Assisted Living Education on Influenza Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM