Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Assisted Living -see also- Group Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0512
Title
Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564 (SB0670)
Title
Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0692
Title
Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0962 (SB0373)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Assisted Living Program License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1063 (SB0969)
Title
Health Care Facilities – Assisted Living Programs – Regulations, Staffing, and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1171 (SB0959)
Title
Public Health – Demonstration Program Developmental Disabilities
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1540 (SB1067)
Title
Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1615 (SB0966)
Title
Health Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Referrals and Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0166
Title
Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0373 (HB0962)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Assisted Living Program License
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0480 (HB0707)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming and Licensure of Assisted Living Managers
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0511
Title
Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670 (HB0564)
Title
Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0959 (HB1171)
Title
Public Health – Demonstration Program and Developmental Disabilities
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0966 (HB1615)
Title
Health Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Referrals and Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0969 (HB1063)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Regulations, Staffing, and Training
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1067 (HB1540)
Title
Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0512 Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0564 (SB0670) Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB0692 Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0962 (SB0373) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Assisted Living Program License Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1063 (SB0969) Health Care Facilities – Assisted Living Programs – Regulations, Staffing, and Training Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1171 (SB0959) Public Health – Demonstration Program Developmental Disabilities Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1540 (SB1067) Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1615 (SB0966) Health Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Referrals and Licenses Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0166 Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0373 (HB0962) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Assisted Living Program License Harford County Senators 4 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0480 (HB0707) State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming and Licensure of Assisted Living Managers Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0511 Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0670 (HB0564) Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0959 (HB1171) Public Health – Demonstration Program and Developmental Disabilities Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0966 (HB1615) Health Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Referrals and Licenses Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0969 (HB1063) Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Regulations, Staffing, and Training Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB1067 (HB1540) Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 5:07 PM