Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Associations -see also- Cooperative Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0169
Title
Health Insurance - Rollback of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Conforming Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1086
Title
State Aid - Business Transparency and Financial Disclosure Act
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1170 /CH0644
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency Requirements
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1250
Title
Ethics - Lobbying Regulation - Associations Representing Counties or Municipal Corporations
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1305
Title
Unincorporated Nonprofit Associations - Members and Officers - Personal Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0350 /CH0490
Title
Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0888
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A, Class C, and Class D Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0169 Health Insurance - Rollback of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Conforming Provisions Delegate Hough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB1086 State Aid - Business Transparency and Financial Disclosure Act Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB1170 /CH0644 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency Requirements Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Economic Matters
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1250 Ethics - Lobbying Regulation - Associations Representing Counties or Municipal Corporations Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1305 Unincorporated Nonprofit Associations - Members and Officers - Personal Liability Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0350 /CH0490 Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014 Senator Brochin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0888 Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A, Class C, and Class D Licenses Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM