Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Associations -see also- Cooperative Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0390 /CH0586 (SB0310/CH0587)
Title
Improving the State Procurement Oversight Structure
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0464 /CH0466
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Exhibition Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0691
Title
Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Filing Fees (Filing Fee Fairness Act of 2017)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0714 (SB0656)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0775 /CH0221 (SB0600/CH0222)
Title
Public Health - Maternal Mental Health
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1190
Title
Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1638
Title
Employee Ownership Trusts
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1641
Title
Corporations and Associations - Nonprofit Corporations - Legislative Advocacy
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0038 /CH0040
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Updating Advisory Boards and Councils
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0325
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - On-Premises Promotions and Product Sampling - Holders of Manufacturer's Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0450 /CH0526 (HB0880/CH0525)
Title
Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and Training
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 /CH0017 (HB0909)
Title
Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0600 /CH0222 (HB0775/CH0221)
Title
Public Health - Maternal Mental Health
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656 (HB0714)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0390 /CH0586 (SB0310/CH0587) Improving the State Procurement Oversight Structure Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 586
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0464 /CH0466 Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Exhibition Permit Delegate Branch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0691 Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Filing Fees (Filing Fee Fairness Act of 2017) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0714 (SB0656) Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution - Repeal Delegate Clark 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0775 /CH0221 (SB0600/CH0222) Public Health - Maternal Mental Health Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1184 Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1190 Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Fees Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1638 Employee Ownership Trusts Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1641 Corporations and Associations - Nonprofit Corporations - Legislative Advocacy Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0038 /CH0040 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Updating Advisory Boards and Councils Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Finance
1/19/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0325 Alcoholic Beverages - On-Premises Promotions and Product Sampling - Holders of Manufacturer's Licenses Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0450 /CH0526 (HB0880/CH0525) Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and Training Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0571 /CH0017 (HB0909) Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act Senator Middleton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17
Finance
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0600 /CH0222 (HB0775/CH0221) Public Health - Maternal Mental Health Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Finance
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0656 (HB0714) Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal Senator Jennings 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM