Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Associations -see also- Cooperative Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0018 (SB0993)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0490 (SB0163/CH0441)
Title
Public Health - Community Health Workers - Advisory Committee and Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0623 (SB0164)
Title
Education - Student Use of Backpacks - Assessment and Reduction of Health Effects
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0666
Title
Health Insurance - Associations - Definitions
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0873 (SB0659/CH0720)
Title
Corporations – Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1286 /CH0839 (SB0614/CH0840)
Title
State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and Process
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1320 /CH0097 (SB0322/CH0098)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1388 (SB0597)
Title
Community Colleges - Supplemental Services and Supports for Students With Disabilities Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0009 /CH0044
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Return of an Original Document - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0163 /CH0441 (HB0490)
Title
Public Health – Community Health Workers – Advisory Committee and Certification
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0164 (HB0623)
Title
Education - Student Use of Backpacks - Assessment and Reduction of Health Effects
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0322 /CH0098 (HB1320/CH0097)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Licenses
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0597 (HB1388)
Title
Community Colleges – Supplemental Services and Supports for Students With Disabilities Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0614 /CH0840 (HB1286/CH0839)
Title
State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and Process
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0659 /CH0720 (HB0873)
Title
Corporations - Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0993 (HB0018)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0018 (SB0993) Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal Delegate Clark 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0490 (SB0163/CH0441) Public Health - Community Health Workers - Advisory Committee and Certification Delegate Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0623 (SB0164) Education - Student Use of Backpacks - Assessment and Reduction of Health Effects Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0666 Health Insurance - Associations - Definitions Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0873 (SB0659/CH0720) Corporations – Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1286 /CH0839 (SB0614/CH0840) State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and Process Delegate Glenn 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 839
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1320 /CH0097 (SB0322/CH0098) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Licenses Delegate Corderman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1388 (SB0597) Community Colleges - Supplemental Services and Supports for Students With Disabilities Grant Program Delegate Jones 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0009 /CH0044 Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Return of an Original Document - Repeal Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0163 /CH0441 (HB0490) Public Health – Community Health Workers – Advisory Committee and Certification Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Finance
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0164 (HB0623) Education - Student Use of Backpacks - Assessment and Reduction of Health Effects Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0322 /CH0098 (HB1320/CH0097) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Licenses Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0597 (HB1388) Community Colleges – Supplemental Services and Supports for Students With Disabilities Grant Program Senator King 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0614 /CH0840 (HB1286/CH0839) State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and Process Senator Robinson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 840
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0659 /CH0720 (HB0873) Corporations - Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 720
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0993 (HB0018) Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM