Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Associations -see also- Cooperative Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0201
Title
Immunities - Associations, Organizations, and Charities - Liability of Agents and Volunteers
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0392
Title
Election Law – Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems – Notification and Termination of Contract
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0475
Title
Community Colleges - Students With Disabilities
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0516 (SB0542)
Title
Public School Students - Daily Physical Activity (Student Health and Fitness Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0784 (SB0957)
Title
Consumer Protection - Online Privacy - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1606
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fees for Processing Articles of Dissolution, Certificates of Cancellation, and Other Documents - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0186 (HB0141)
Title
Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Corporation Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0542 (HB0516)
Title
Public School Students - Daily Physical Activity (Student Health and Fitness Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0957 (HB0784)
Title
Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0201 Immunities - Associations, Organizations, and Charities - Liability of Agents and Volunteers Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0392 Election Law – Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems – Notification and Termination of Contract Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Ways and Means
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0475 Community Colleges - Students With Disabilities Delegate Cain 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0516 (SB0542) Public School Students - Daily Physical Activity (Student Health and Fitness Act) Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0784 (SB0957) Consumer Protection - Online Privacy - Study Delegate Carey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
3/09/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1606 Corporations and Associations - Fees for Processing Articles of Dissolution, Certificates of Cancellation, and Other Documents - Repeal Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0186 (HB0141) Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Corporation Act - Revisions Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0542 (HB0516) Public School Students - Daily Physical Activity (Student Health and Fitness Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0957 (HB0784) Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0987 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2020 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/24/2020 8:01 AM