Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Attachments and Garnishments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0437 (SB0753)
Title
Maryland Trust Act
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0629
Title
Courts - Garnishment of Joint Account - Burden of Proof (Bank Customer Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0814
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Collection - Attachment Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0921 /CH0652 (SB0258)
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of Crime
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071
Title
Child Support Enforcement - Attachment and Seizure of Retirement Accounts and Claims Against Retirement Plans
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258 (HB0921/CH0652)
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of Crime
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0553 /CH0499
Title
Tipped Employees - Payments or Deduction from Wages - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0753 (HB0437)
Title
Maryland Trust Act
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0437 (SB0753) Maryland Trust Act Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0629 Courts - Garnishment of Joint Account - Burden of Proof (Bank Customer Protection Act) Delegate Norman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0814 Commercial Law - Debt Collection - Attachment Fees Delegate Norman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0921 /CH0652 (SB0258) Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of Crime Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0071 Child Support Enforcement - Attachment and Seizure of Retirement Accounts and Claims Against Retirement Plans Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/10/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0258 (HB0921/CH0652) Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of Crime Senator Shank 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0553 /CH0499 Tipped Employees - Payments or Deduction from Wages - Prohibition Senator Getty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 499
Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0753 (HB0437) Maryland Trust Act Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM