Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Attachments and Garnishments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 /CH0039 (SB0355)
Title
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0707 /CH0195 (SB0372/CH0194)
Title
Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and Restitution
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 (SB1005/CH0515)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0078 /CH0044
Title
State Lottery and Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Remittance of Intercepted Prizes
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090 /CH0342
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits and Penalties for Fraud
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355 (HB0431/CH0039)
Title
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0372 /CH0194 (HB0707/CH0195)
Title
Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and Restitution
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0397
Title
Civil Actions and Procedures - Garnishments - Spousal Property
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0431 /CH0039 (SB0355) Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Establishment Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0707 /CH0195 (SB0372/CH0194) Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and Restitution Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Ways and Means
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1312 (SB1005/CH0515) Justice Reinvestment Act Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/04/2016 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
SB0078 /CH0044 State Lottery and Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Remittance of Intercepted Prizes Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0090 /CH0342 Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits and Penalties for Fraud Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0355 (HB0431/CH0039) Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Establishment Senator Feldman 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0372 /CH0194 (HB0707/CH0195) Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and Restitution Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0397 Civil Actions and Procedures - Garnishments - Spousal Property Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM