Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Attachments and Garnishments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895 (SB0655)
Title
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1435 (SB0725)
Title
Civil Actions - Discovery in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment - Body Attachment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0512
Title
Civil Actions and Procedures - Garnishments - Spousal Property
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0655 (HB0895)
Title
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725 (HB1435)
Title
Civil Actions - Discovery in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment - Body Attachment
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0950
Title
Debt Collection - Attachment and Execution - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0895 (SB0655) Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1435 (SB0725) Civil Actions - Discovery in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment - Body Attachment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0512 Civil Actions and Procedures - Garnishments - Spousal Property Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0655 (HB0895) Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0725 (HB1435) Civil Actions - Discovery in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment - Body Attachment Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0950 Debt Collection - Attachment and Execution - Exemptions Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM