Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Auctions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0029
Title
Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers and Pawnbrokers - Exemptions for Auctioneers
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1006
Title
Real Estate Brokers - Exemption for Auctioneers - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1150
Title
State Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Maryland Competitive Pharmacy Benefits Manager Marketplace Act
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1349 (SB0890)
Title
Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0890 (HB1349)
Title
Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0029 Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers and Pawnbrokers - Exemptions for Auctioneers Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1006 Real Estate Brokers - Exemption for Auctioneers - Repeal Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1150 State Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Maryland Competitive Pharmacy Benefits Manager Marketplace Act Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1349 (SB0890) Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0890 (HB1349) Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/11/2020 9:01 AM