Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Audiologists and Speech Pathologists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0690 (SB0734/CH0512)
Title
Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1355
Title
Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1384 /CH0741 (SB0677/CH0742)
Title
Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0677 /CH0742 (HB1384/CH0741)
Title
Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0734 /CH0512 (HB0690)
Title
Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0690 (SB0734/CH0512) Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
HB1355 Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Revisions Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1384 /CH0741 (SB0677/CH0742) Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents Delegate Bhandari 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 741
Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0677 /CH0742 (HB1384/CH0741) Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 742
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Health and Government Operations
SB0734 /CH0512 (HB0690) Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:18 PM