Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Autism Spectrum

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847 /CH0341
Title
State Coordinator for Autism Strategy and Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1118 /CH0427 (SB0885)
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration – Voluntary Developmental Disability Self–Disclosure Cards – Design and Issuance
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0637
Title
Children – Therapeutic Child Care Program – Funding
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0885 (HB1118/CH0427)
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration – Voluntary Developmental Disability Self–Disclosure Cards – Design and Issuance
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0847 /CH0341 State Coordinator for Autism Strategy and Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs Delegate Guyton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 341
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1118 /CH0427 (SB0885) Motor Vehicle Administration – Voluntary Developmental Disability Self–Disclosure Cards – Design and Issuance Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 427
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0637 Children – Therapeutic Child Care Program – Funding Senator King 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0885 (HB1118/CH0427) Motor Vehicle Administration – Voluntary Developmental Disability Self–Disclosure Cards – Design and Issuance Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:48 PM
Click to return on the top page