Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Automotive Repair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574 (SB0487)
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1275 (SB0687/CH0326)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With Dealers
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1311
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Aftermarket Parts - Warranty Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006 /CH0003
Title
Vehicle Laws - Preventive Maintenance Program - Preventive Maintenance Technician
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0487 (HB0574)
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0687 /CH0326 (HB1275)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With Dealers
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0574 (SB0487) Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1275 (SB0687/CH0326) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With Dealers Delegate Frush 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1311 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Aftermarket Parts - Warranty Requirements Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0006 /CH0003 Vehicle Laws - Preventive Maintenance Program - Preventive Maintenance Technician Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0487 (HB0574) Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0687 /CH0326 (HB1275) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With Dealers Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM