Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Automotive Repair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0434 (SB0529)
Title
Vehicle Manufacturers - Notice to Purchasers and Lessees - Warranty Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0751 (SB0478)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Full Circle Auto Repair and Training Center
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1743 (SB1175)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Vehicles for Change
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0478 (HB0751)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Full Circle Auto Repair and Training Center
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0529 (HB0434)
Title
Vehicle Manufacturers - Notice to Purchasers and Lessees - Warranty Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1175 (HB1743)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Vehicles for Change
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0434 (SB0529) Vehicle Manufacturers - Notice to Purchasers and Lessees - Warranty Requirements Delegate Davis 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments
Economic Matters
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0751 (SB0478) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Full Circle Auto Repair and Training Center Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1743 (SB1175) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Vehicles for Change Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
SB0478 (HB0751) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Full Circle Auto Repair and Training Center Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0529 (HB0434) Vehicle Manufacturers - Notice to Purchasers and Lessees - Warranty Requirements Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1175 (HB1743) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Vehicles for Change Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 4:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 4:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM