Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Awards, Medals and Prizes -see also- Gaming

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0010
Title
State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Public Prekindergarten Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0143
Title
Carroll County and Montgomery County – Gaming – Bingo Games MC 13–18
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0159 /CH0122
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer Permit MC 21-18
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0781 /CH0388 (SB0842/CH0389)
Title
Higher Education - Educational Excellence Award Eligibility - High School Diploma by Examination
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0868 (SB0992)
Title
Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094 /CH0670
Title
Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and Mammals
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0790
Title
General Provisions – Historical State Song
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0842 /CH0389 (HB0781/CH0388)
Title
Higher Education - Educational Excellence Award Eligibility - High School Diploma by Examination
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0992 (HB0868)
Title
Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0010 State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Public Prekindergarten Programs Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0143 Carroll County and Montgomery County – Gaming – Bingo Games MC 13–18 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0159 /CH0122 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer Permit MC 21-18 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0781 /CH0388 (SB0842/CH0389) Higher Education - Educational Excellence Award Eligibility - High School Diploma by Examination Delegate Mosby 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Ways and Means
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0868 (SB0992) Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0094 /CH0670 Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and Mammals Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0790 General Provisions – Historical State Song Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0842 /CH0389 (HB0781/CH0388) Higher Education - Educational Excellence Award Eligibility - High School Diploma by Examination Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0992 (HB0868) Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM