Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Awards, Medals and Prizes -see also- Gaming

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0048 /CH0338
Title
eSports Act
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0198 /CH0590 (SB0006/CH0591)
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer Permit
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0340
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0447 /CH0655 (SB0325/CH0656)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564 /CH0170
Title
Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 1-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0573 (SB0257)
Title
Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal and Sororal Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0579 (SB0351)
Title
Workgroup to Study Prize-Linked Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0970
Title
Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0987
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Operator Compliance - Disclosure of Winning Odds on Video Lottery Terminals
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1015 (SB0326)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1326
Title
State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Distribution to Local Boards of Education
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006 /CH0591 (HB0198/CH0590)
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer Permit
Sponsor
Wicomico County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0257 (HB0573)
Title
Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal and Sororal Organizations
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0325 /CH0656 (HB0447/CH0655)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0326 (HB1015)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0351 (HB0579)
Title
Workgroup to Study Prize-Linked Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0463
Title
Education - Noncertificated Public School Employees - Employee of the Year Award
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0740
Title
Counties – Innovative Development Competitions
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0751
Title
Governor’s Appointments Office, Appointing Authorities, and the Secretary of Budget and Management – Duties and Reports
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0048 /CH0338 eSports Act Delegate Grammer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Ways and Means
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0198 /CH0590 (SB0006/CH0591) Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer Permit Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0340 State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0447 /CH0655 (SB0325/CH0656) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 655
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0564 /CH0170 Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 1-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Ways and Means
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0573 (SB0257) Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal and Sororal Organizations Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0579 (SB0351) Workgroup to Study Prize-Linked Savings Accounts Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0970 Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0987 Gaming - Video Lottery Operator Compliance - Disclosure of Winning Odds on Video Lottery Terminals Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1015 (SB0326) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1326 State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Distribution to Local Boards of Education Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0006 /CH0591 (HB0198/CH0590) Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer Permit Wicomico County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 591
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0257 (HB0573) Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal and Sororal Organizations Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0325 /CH0656 (HB0447/CH0655) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 656
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0326 (HB1015) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0351 (HB0579) Workgroup to Study Prize-Linked Savings Accounts Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0463 Education - Noncertificated Public School Employees - Employee of the Year Award Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0740 Counties – Innovative Development Competitions Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0751 Governor’s Appointments Office, Appointing Authorities, and the Secretary of Budget and Management – Duties and Reports Senator Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:18 PM