Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Operating Budget (B1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133 (SB0030)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Appropriation Reductions (Board of Public Works Budget Reduction Clarification Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0251 (SB0244)
Title
Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Nonbudgeted State Agencies
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255
Title
Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0310 (SB0323)
Title
Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0499
Title
Rental Housing Restitution Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0588
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2022)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589 (SB0493)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0030 (HB0133)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Appropriation Reductions (Board of Public Works Budget Reduction Clarification Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0244 (HB0251)
Title
Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Nonbudgeted State Agencies
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0323 (HB0310)
Title
Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0491
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2022)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0493 (HB0589)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0133 (SB0030) State Finance and Procurement - Appropriation Reductions (Board of Public Works Budget Reduction Clarification Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0251 (SB0244) Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Nonbudgeted State Agencies Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0255 Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs - Funding Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0310 (SB0323) Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0499 Rental Housing Restitution Fund - Establishment Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0588 Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2022) Speaker 3 2 In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Appropriations
HB0589 (SB0493) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021 Speaker 3 2 In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Appropriations
SB0030 (HB0133) State Finance and Procurement - Appropriation Reductions (Board of Public Works Budget Reduction Clarification Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0244 (HB0251) Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Nonbudgeted State Agencies Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0323 (HB0310) Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0491 Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2022) President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
SB0493 (HB0589) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 1/20/2021 12:05 PM