Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Operating Budget (B1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0059
Title
Dedicated State Funds Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0100 /CH0423 (SB0125)
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2014)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0240
Title
Operating Budget - Capital Gains Tax Revenue - Appropriation to Revenue Stabilization Account
Sponsor
Delegate James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0686
Title
Professional Boards Special Funds - Transfer of Funds - Three-Fifths Committee Vote
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0914
Title
County Income Tax Disparity Grants - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1474 (SB0958)
Title
Education - State Funding - Operating and Capital Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1494 /CH0688 (SB0876)
Title
Correctional Services - Standards for Correctional Facilities - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0125 (HB0100/CH0423)
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2014)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0831
Title
State Budget - Evidence-Based Policy Options
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0876 (HB1494/CH0688)
Title
Correctional Services - Standards for Correctional Facilities - Funding
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0958 (HB1474)
Title
Education - State Funding - Operating and Capital Funds
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1055
Title
State Aid for Critical Services - County Maintenance of Effort Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0059 Dedicated State Funds Protection Act Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0100 /CH0423 (SB0125) Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2014) Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 423
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0240 Operating Budget - Capital Gains Tax Revenue - Appropriation to Revenue Stabilization Account Delegate James 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/05/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0686 Professional Boards Special Funds - Transfer of Funds - Three-Fifths Committee Vote Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0914 County Income Tax Disparity Grants - Alterations Delegate Serafini 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1474 (SB0958) Education - State Funding - Operating and Capital Funds Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1494 /CH0688 (SB0876) Correctional Services - Standards for Correctional Facilities - Funding Delegate Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 688
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0125 (HB0100/CH0423) Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2014) President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0831 State Budget - Evidence-Based Policy Options Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0876 (HB1494/CH0688) Correctional Services - Standards for Correctional Facilities - Funding Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0958 (HB1474) Education - State Funding - Operating and Capital Funds Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1055 State Aid for Critical Services - County Maintenance of Effort Requirements Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM