Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Operating Budget (B1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0114
Title
Education - Geographic Cost of Education - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0160 (SB0170/CH0462)
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2015)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 (SB0172/CH0464)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560
Title
Task Force to Study Federal Funding in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0711
Title
Transfer Tax Revenues - Special Fund Transfers - Two-Thirds Vote
Sponsor
Delegate Kach
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0754
Title
Dedicated State Funds Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0998 (SB0647)
Title
Public Higher Education - Use of Funds - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1110
Title
Public Schools and Libraries - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1340
Title
Education - Calculation of State Appropriation - Information Transparency in Budget Books
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0170 /CH0462 (HB0160)
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2015)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0628
Title
Task Force to Study the Needs and Expenditures of State Programs
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0647 (HB0998)
Title
Public Higher Education - Use of Funds - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0726
Title
Education - State Funding - Operating and Capital Funds
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0821
Title
Digital Equity for All Maryland Students Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0114 Education - Geographic Cost of Education - Requirement Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0160 (SB0170/CH0462) Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2015) Speaker 3 2 In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Appropriations
HB0162 (SB0172/CH0464) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0560 Task Force to Study Federal Funding in Maryland Delegate Bates 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0711 Transfer Tax Revenues - Special Fund Transfers - Two-Thirds Vote Delegate Kach 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0754 Dedicated State Funds Protection Act Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0998 (SB0647) Public Higher Education - Use of Funds - Prohibition Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1110 Public Schools and Libraries - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - Prohibited Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1274 Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1340 Education - Calculation of State Appropriation - Information Transparency in Budget Books Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0170 /CH0462 (HB0160) Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2015) President 3 2 Enacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 462
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0628 Task Force to Study the Needs and Expenditures of State Programs Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 PM
SB0647 (HB0998) Public Higher Education - Use of Funds - Prohibition Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0726 Education - State Funding - Operating and Capital Funds Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0821 Digital Equity for All Maryland Students Act of 2014 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM