Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Operating Budget (B1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0070 /CH0310 (SB0055)
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2016)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210 (SB0268)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0215 (SB0183/CH0477)
Title
Education - Geographic Cost of Education - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633
Title
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Use of Funds - Compliance With Watershed Implementation Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0787
Title
Dedicated State Funds Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855
Title
Law Enforcement Explorer Program - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1211
Title
State Budget - Board of Public Works - Notice of Reductions in Appropriations
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0055 (HB0070/CH0310)
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2016)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0171
Title
Program Open Space - Baltimore City - Purchase Talbot Road Property
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0183 /CH0477 (HB0215)
Title
Education - Geographic Cost of Education - Requirement
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0268 (HB0210)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0660
Title
State Budget
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0862 /CH0389
Title
Maryland Park Service - Operations Revenue - Mandated Appropriation
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0885
Title
Education Funding and Formulas - Amendment - Supermajority Vote
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0070 /CH0310 (SB0055) Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2016) Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 310
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0210 (SB0268) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0215 (SB0183/CH0477) Education - Geographic Cost of Education - Requirement Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0633 Cigarette Restitution Fund - Use of Funds - Compliance With Watershed Implementation Plans Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0787 Dedicated State Funds Protection Act Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0855 Law Enforcement Explorer Program - Funding Delegate Knotts 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1211 State Budget - Board of Public Works - Notice of Reductions in Appropriations Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0055 (HB0070/CH0310) Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2016) President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0171 Program Open Space - Baltimore City - Purchase Talbot Road Property Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0183 /CH0477 (HB0215) Education - Geographic Cost of Education - Requirement Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 477
Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0268 (HB0210) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0660 State Budget Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0862 /CH0389 Maryland Park Service - Operations Revenue - Mandated Appropriation Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0885 Education Funding and Formulas - Amendment - Supermajority Vote Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM