Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Operating Budget (B1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0110 (SB0745)
Title
Law Enforcement Explorer Program - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0120 /CH0095
Title
State Budget - Department of Budget and Management - Statement of Dedicated State Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0144 (SB0337/CH0549)
Title
Libraries - Regional, State, and County - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0150 (SB0190/CH0143)
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2017)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0368 /CH0015 (SB0370/CH0014)
Title
Board of Public Works Transparency Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0449 (SB0375)
Title
Relief From Budget Mandates
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0753 (SB0808)
Title
State Budget
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1176
Title
Rental Deposit Assistance Loan Programs and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1375
Title
Public Schools and Libraries - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1456
Title
Public Schools - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0190 /CH0143 (HB0150)
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2017)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0337 /CH0549 (HB0144)
Title
Libraries - Regional, State, and County - Funding
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0370 /CH0014 (HB0368/CH0015)
Title
Board of Public Works Transparency Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0375 (HB0449)
Title
Relief From Budget Mandates
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0745 (HB0110)
Title
Law Enforcement Explorer Program - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0808 (HB0753)
Title
State Budget
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0110 (SB0745) Law Enforcement Explorer Program - Funding Delegate Knotts 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0120 /CH0095 State Budget - Department of Budget and Management - Statement of Dedicated State Funds Delegate Krimm 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Appropriations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0144 (SB0337/CH0549) Libraries - Regional, State, and County - Funding Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/04/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0150 (SB0190/CH0143) Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2017) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
HB0368 /CH0015 (SB0370/CH0014) Board of Public Works Transparency Act of 2016 Delegate Korman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15
Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0449 (SB0375) Relief From Budget Mandates Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0753 (SB0808) State Budget Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1176 Rental Deposit Assistance Loan Programs and Fund Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1375 Public Schools and Libraries - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - Prohibited Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1456 Public Schools - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - Prohibited Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0190 /CH0143 (HB0150) Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2017) President 3 2 Enacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 143
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
SB0337 /CH0549 (HB0144) Libraries - Regional, State, and County - Funding Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0370 /CH0014 (HB0368/CH0015) Board of Public Works Transparency Act of 2016 Senator Madaleno 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 14
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0375 (HB0449) Relief From Budget Mandates President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0745 (HB0110) Law Enforcement Explorer Program - Funding Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0808 (HB0753) State Budget Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM