Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Operating Budget (B1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0028 /CH0557
Title
Unappropriated General Fund Surplus - Appropriation to Pension Fund and Postretirement Health Benefits Trust Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0150 /CH0150 (SB0170)
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2018)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0152 /CH0023 (SB0172)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0265
Title
Program Open Space - Authorized Transfer to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Fund - Phased-In Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0267 /CH0660 (SB0257/CH0661)
Title
Program Open Space - Authorized Transfer to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Financing Fund - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0420 (SB0303)
Title
Commonsense Spending Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0430 (SB0306)
Title
Fiscal Responsibility Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0442
Title
Volkswagen Settlement Funds - Use of Environmental Mitigation Trust
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0503 /CH0004 (SB0371/CH0550)
Title
State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization Account
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0708 /CH0551
Title
State Department of Education - Lacrosse Opportunities Program - Youth Lacrosse Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0984 (SB0475)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1187 (SB0784)
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Youth Services Bureau - Budget Appropriation
Sponsor
Delegate Gaines
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0161
Title
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Allocation
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0170 (HB0150/CH0150)
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2018)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 (HB0152/CH0023)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0257 /CH0661 (HB0267/CH0660)
Title
Program Open Space - Authorized Transfer to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Financing Fund - Increase
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0303 (HB0420)
Title
Commonsense Spending Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0306 (HB0430)
Title
Fiscal Responsibility Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0371 /CH0550 (HB0503/CH0004)
Title
State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization Account
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0475 (HB0984)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0690
Title
State Budget
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0784 (HB1187)
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Youth Services Bureau - Budget Appropriation
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0839
Title
Workgroup on Categories for Funding Priorities in the Annual State Budget
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1198 /CH0019
Title
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2017
Sponsor
Prince George's County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0028 /CH0557 Unappropriated General Fund Surplus - Appropriation to Pension Fund and Postretirement Health Benefits Trust Fund Delegate Krimm 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 9:00 AM
HB0150 /CH0150 (SB0170) Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2018) Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 150
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB0152 /CH0023 (SB0172) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0265 Program Open Space - Authorized Transfer to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Fund - Phased-In Increase Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0267 /CH0660 (SB0257/CH0661) Program Open Space - Authorized Transfer to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Financing Fund - Increase Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 660
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0420 (SB0303) Commonsense Spending Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0430 (SB0306) Fiscal Responsibility Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0442 Volkswagen Settlement Funds - Use of Environmental Mitigation Trust Delegate Robinson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0503 /CH0004 (SB0371/CH0550) State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization Account Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Appropriations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0708 /CH0551 State Department of Education - Lacrosse Opportunities Program - Youth Lacrosse Nonprofit Organizations Delegate Walker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0984 (SB0475) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and Reporting Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
Appropriations
HB1187 (SB0784) Department of Juvenile Services - Youth Services Bureau - Budget Appropriation Delegate Gaines 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0161 Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Allocation Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0170 (HB0150/CH0150) Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2018) President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
SB0172 (HB0152/CH0023) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0257 /CH0661 (HB0267/CH0660) Program Open Space - Authorized Transfer to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Financing Fund - Increase Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 661
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0303 (HB0420) Commonsense Spending Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0306 (HB0430) Fiscal Responsibility Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0371 /CH0550 (HB0503/CH0004) State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization Account Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0475 (HB0984) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and Reporting Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0690 State Budget Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2017 - 2:30 PM
SB0784 (HB1187) Department of Juvenile Services - Youth Services Bureau - Budget Appropriation Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0839 Workgroup on Categories for Funding Priorities in the Annual State Budget Senator Serafini 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1198 /CH0019 Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2017 Prince George's County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM