Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Operating Budget (B1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071
Title
Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Nonbudgeted State Agencies
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0127 (SB0287)
Title
Maryland Arts and Culture Capital Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0150
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2021)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0152 (SB0192)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0205 (SB0105)
Title
Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Requirements and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0498
Title
Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 (SB0421)
Title
Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority - Reestablishment
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0745
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Senior and Vulnerable Adult Asset Recovery Unit
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1061
Title
Capital Funding - Deferred Maintenance - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1332
Title
State Budget
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1423
Title
Human Services - Department of Aging - Budget
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1526
Title
Transportation Carbon Reduction Fund – Establishment (Transportation Carbon Fund Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1570 (SB1009)
Title
State Budget - Relief From Budget Mandates
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1661 (SB1079/CH0012)
Title
State Budget - Revenue Stabilization Account Transfers - Coronavirus
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1664
Title
Operating Budget - Education Programs - Mandated Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0105 (HB0205)
Title
Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Requirements and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0190
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2021)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0192 (HB0152)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2020
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0287 (HB0127)
Title
Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0407
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Senior and Vulnerable Adult Asset Recovery Unit
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0421 (HB0735)
Title
Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority - Reestablishment
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1009 (HB1570)
Title
State Budget - Relief From Budget Mandates
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1028
Title
Balancing the State Budget
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1079 /CH0012 (HB1661)
Title
State Budget - Revenue Stabilization Account Transfers - Coronavirus
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0071 Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Nonbudgeted State Agencies Delegate Carr 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Appropriations
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0127 (SB0287) Maryland Arts and Culture Capital Grant Program Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0150 Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2021) Speaker 3 2 In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Appropriations
HB0152 (SB0192) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2020 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0205 (SB0105) Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Requirements and Funding Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Appropriations
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0498 Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs - Funding Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
HB0735 (SB0421) Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority - Reestablishment Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0745 Office of the Attorney General - Senior and Vulnerable Adult Asset Recovery Unit Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1061 Capital Funding - Deferred Maintenance - Reporting Requirements Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1332 State Budget Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1423 Human Services - Department of Aging - Budget Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1526 Transportation Carbon Reduction Fund – Establishment (Transportation Carbon Fund Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1570 (SB1009) State Budget - Relief From Budget Mandates Speaker 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1661 (SB1079/CH0012) State Budget - Revenue Stabilization Account Transfers - Coronavirus Speaker 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
3/06/2020 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1664 Operating Budget - Education Programs - Mandated Funding Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Appropriations
SB0105 (HB0205) Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Requirements and Funding Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/09/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0190 Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2021) President 3 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
3/13/2020 - 3:00 PM
SB0192 (HB0152) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2020 President 3 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/13/2020 - 3:00 PM
SB0287 (HB0127) Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0407 Office of the Attorney General - Senior and Vulnerable Adult Asset Recovery Unit Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
Appropriations
SB0421 (HB0735) Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority - Reestablishment Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB1009 (HB1570) State Budget - Relief From Budget Mandates President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1028 Balancing the State Budget Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/18/2020 - 9:30 AM
SB1079 /CH0012 (HB1661) State Budget - Revenue Stabilization Account Transfers - Coronavirus President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/06/2020 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/24/2020 8:04 AM