Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Operating Budget (B1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133 (SB0030)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Appropriation Reductions (Board of Public Works Budget Reduction Clarification Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0251 (SB0244)
Title
Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Real Property Records Improvement Fund and Nonbudgeted State Agencies
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255
Title
Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0310 (SB0323)
Title
Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0499
Title
Rental Housing Restitution Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0588
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2022)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589 (SB0493)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0898
Title
Operating Budget – Unanticipated Federal Funds – Authorized Uses
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0935 (SB0640)
Title
Emergency Community Services Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1053 (SB0882)
Title
Operating Budget - Education Programs - Mandated Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1237 (SB0908)
Title
Budget Bill – Appropriations Statement – Memorandum of Understanding for State Personnel
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0030 (HB0133)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Appropriation Reductions (Board of Public Works Budget Reduction Clarification Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0244 (HB0251)
Title
Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Nonbudgeted State Agencies
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0323 (HB0310)
Title
Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0491
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2022)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0493 (HB0589)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 (HB0935)
Title
Emergency Community Services Fund
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0647
Title
Federal COVID-19 Relief Funding - Report
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0882 (HB1053)
Title
Operating Budget - Education Programs - Mandated Funding
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0908 (HB1237)
Title
Budget Bill – Appropriations Statement – Memorandum of Understanding for State Personnel
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0133 (SB0030) State Finance and Procurement - Appropriation Reductions (Board of Public Works Budget Reduction Clarification Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0251 (SB0244) Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Real Property Records Improvement Fund and Nonbudgeted State Agencies Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0255 Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs - Funding Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0310 (SB0323) Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0499 Rental Housing Restitution Fund - Establishment Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0588 Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2022) Speaker 3 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB0589 (SB0493) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021 Speaker 3 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0898 Operating Budget – Unanticipated Federal Funds – Authorized Uses Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0935 (SB0640) Emergency Community Services Fund Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1053 (SB0882) Operating Budget - Education Programs - Mandated Funding Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1237 (SB0908) Budget Bill – Appropriations Statement – Memorandum of Understanding for State Personnel Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0030 (HB0133) State Finance and Procurement - Appropriation Reductions (Board of Public Works Budget Reduction Clarification Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0244 (HB0251) Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Nonbudgeted State Agencies Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0323 (HB0310) Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0491 Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2022) President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
SB0493 (HB0589) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 (HB0935) Emergency Community Services Fund Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0647 Federal COVID-19 Relief Funding - Report Senator King 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0882 (HB1053) Operating Budget - Education Programs - Mandated Funding Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0908 (HB1237) Budget Bill – Appropriations Statement – Memorandum of Understanding for State Personnel Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/15/2021 6:58 PM
Click to return on the top page