Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0097 /CH0596 (SB0261)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0645 (SB0461/CH0285)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0783 (SB0343/CH0326)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0261 (HB0097/CH0596)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0343 /CH0326 (HB0783)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461 /CH0285 (HB0645)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0097 /CH0596 (SB0261) St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 596
Appropriations
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0645 (SB0461/CH0285) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0783 (SB0343/CH0326) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0261 (HB0097/CH0596) St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond Senator Bailey 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0343 /CH0326 (HB0783) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond Senator Bailey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 326
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0461 /CH0285 (HB0645) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 285
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:30 PM