Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Prior Authorizations (B4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0750 /CH0272 (SB0116)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2013 and 2014 - Baltimore City - Skatepark of Baltimore at Roosevelt Park
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0925 (SB0744/CH0196)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Montgomery County - Water Park at Bohrer Park
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 (HB0750/CH0272)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2013 and 2014 - Baltimore City - Skatepark of Baltimore at Roosevelt Park
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0744 /CH0196 (HB0925)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Montgomery County - Water Park at Bohrer Park
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0750 /CH0272 (SB0116) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2013 and 2014 - Baltimore City - Skatepark of Baltimore at Roosevelt Park Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0925 (SB0744/CH0196) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Montgomery County - Water Park at Bohrer Park Delegate Barve 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0116 (HB0750/CH0272) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2013 and 2014 - Baltimore City - Skatepark of Baltimore at Roosevelt Park Senator Pugh 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0744 /CH0196 (HB0925) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Montgomery County - Water Park at Bohrer Park Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM
Click to return on the top page