Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Prior Authorizations (B4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0074 /CH0021 (SB0782/CH0087)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014 - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High Stadium
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1579 /CH0510 (SB1099/CH0511)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016 - Baltimore County - Morning Star Family Life Center
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0782 /CH0087 (HB0074/CH0021)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014 - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High Stadium
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1099 /CH0511 (HB1579/CH0510)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016 - Baltimore County - Morning Star Family Life Center
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0074 /CH0021 (SB0782/CH0087) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014 - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High Stadium Delegate Grammer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1579 /CH0510 (SB1099/CH0511) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016 - Baltimore County - Morning Star Family Life Center Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0782 /CH0087 (HB0074/CH0021) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014 - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High Stadium Senator Salling 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1099 /CH0511 (HB1579/CH0510) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016 - Baltimore County - Morning Star Family Life Center Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM