Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Capital Budget (B5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0101 /CH0424 (SB0126)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, and 2012
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0115 /CH0426 (SB0141)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy Bonds
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0146 (SB0174)
Title
Education - Public Charter Schools - Capital Improvement Requests
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0616 /CH0123
Title
Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685 (SB0633/CH0512)
Title
Libraries - County Library Capital Project Grant - Wealth-Based Cost Share
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0771
Title
Mass Transit Trust Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860 /CH0647 (SB0743)
Title
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1249
Title
Baltimore City - School Construction - Block Grants
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1474 (SB0958)
Title
Education - State Funding - Operating and Capital Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1510
Title
Montgomery County - Transportation - Block Grant
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0126 (HB0101/CH0424)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, and 2012
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0141 (HB0115/CH0426)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy Bonds
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0174 (HB0146)
Title
Education - Public Charter Schools - Capital Improvement Requests
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0569
Title
Capital Budget - Local Initiatives - Matching Funds
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0633 /CH0512 (HB0685)
Title
Libraries - County Library Capital Project Grant - Wealth-Based Cost Share
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743 (HB0860/CH0647)
Title
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0958 (HB1474)
Title
Education - State Funding - Operating and Capital Funds
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0101 /CH0424 (SB0126) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, and 2012 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB0115 /CH0426 (SB0141) Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy Bonds Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Appropriations
2/05/2013 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0146 (SB0174) Education - Public Charter Schools - Capital Improvement Requests Delegate Kipke 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/05/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0616 /CH0123 Academic Facilities Bonding Authority Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0685 (SB0633/CH0512) Libraries - County Library Capital Project Grant - Wealth-Based Cost Share Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0771 Mass Transit Trust Fund Delegate Bates 2 2 In the House - Reassigned to Ways and Means and Appropriations
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0860 /CH0647 (SB0743) Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013 Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
Appropriations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1249 Baltimore City - School Construction - Block Grants Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1474 (SB0958) Education - State Funding - Operating and Capital Funds Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1510 Montgomery County - Transportation - Block Grant Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0126 (HB0101/CH0424) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, and 2012 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
SB0141 (HB0115/CH0426) Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy Bonds President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0174 (HB0146) Education - Public Charter Schools - Capital Improvement Requests Anne Arundel County Senators 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0569 Capital Budget - Local Initiatives - Matching Funds Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0633 /CH0512 (HB0685) Libraries - County Library Capital Project Grant - Wealth-Based Cost Share Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0743 (HB0860/CH0647) Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013 Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0958 (HB1474) Education - State Funding - Operating and Capital Funds Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM