Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Capital Budget (B5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071 /CH0495 (SB0056)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2004, 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, and 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0130 (SB0601/CH0371)
Title
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210 (SB0268)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0900 (SB0492)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Cornerstone Montgomery and Interfaith Works Project
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0923 (SB0490/CH0355)
Title
Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable Classrooms
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1182 /CH0471 (SB0821)
Title
Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0056 (HB0071/CH0495)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2004, 2005, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, and 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0171
Title
Program Open Space - Baltimore City - Purchase Talbot Road Property
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0268 (HB0210)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0490 /CH0355 (HB0923)
Title
Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable Classrooms
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0492 (HB0900)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Cornerstone Montgomery and Interfaith Works Project
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0601 /CH0371 (HB0130)
Title
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and Revisions
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0821 (HB1182/CH0471)
Title
Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0071 /CH0495 (SB0056) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2004, 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, and 2014 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495;Item ZA00(I) - Maryland Hall for the Creative Arts - Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2016
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB0130 (SB0601/CH0371) African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and Revisions Delegate Jones 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0210 (SB0268) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0900 (SB0492) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Cornerstone Montgomery and Interfaith Works Project Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/16/2015 - 9:00 AM
HB0923 (SB0490/CH0355) Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable Classrooms Delegate Hixson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1182 /CH0471 (SB0821) Academic Facilities Bonding Authority Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0056 (HB0071/CH0495) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2004, 2005, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, and 2014 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
SB0171 Program Open Space - Baltimore City - Purchase Talbot Road Property Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0268 (HB0210) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0490 /CH0355 (HB0923) Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable Classrooms Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/08/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0492 (HB0900) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Cornerstone Montgomery and Interfaith Works Project Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2015 - 11:00 AM
SB0601 /CH0371 (HB0130) African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and Revisions Senator McFadden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0821 (HB1182/CH0471) Academic Facilities Bonding Authority Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM