Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Capital Budget (B5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0138 (SB1080)
Title
Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assistive Listening System Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 (SB0186/CH0009)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2018, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, and 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372 /CH0352 (SB0277/CH0351)
Title
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1783 /CH0014 (SB1243)
Title
21st Century School Facilities Act
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0186 /CH0009 (HB0162)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2018, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, and 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277 /CH0351 (HB0372/CH0352)
Title
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1064 /CH0553
Title
Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1080 (HB0138)
Title
Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assistive Listening System Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1243 (HB1783/CH0014)
Title
21st Century School Facilities Act
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0138 (SB1080) Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assistive Listening System Requirement Delegate Knotts 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0162 (SB0186/CH0009) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2018, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, and 2017 Speaker 3 2 In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Appropriations
HB0372 /CH0352 (SB0277/CH0351) Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1783 /CH0014 (SB1243) 21st Century School Facilities Act Delegate Jones 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 14
Appropriations
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0186 /CH0009 (HB0162) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2018, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, and 2017 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
SB0277 /CH0351 (HB0372/CH0352) Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2018 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1064 /CH0553 Academic Facilities Bonding Authority Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1080 (HB0138) Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assistive Listening System Requirement Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1243 (HB1783/CH0014) 21st Century School Facilities Act Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2018 - 1:45 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM