Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Capital Budget (B5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0101 /CH0014 (SB0126)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2019, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2009, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, and 2018
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0332 /CH0540 (SB0158)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0668 (SB0641)
Title
Public School Construction - Maryland Stadium Authority - Montgomery County and Other School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1034
Title
Education - Interagency Commission on School Construction - Reimbursement to Eligible Counties
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1131 (SB0758)
Title
Baltimore County - Maryland Stadium Authority - Public School Construction
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1192 /CH0336 (SB1014/CH0337)
Title
Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1352 /CH0148
Title
University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1370 (SB0986)
Title
Baltimore City - Public School Construction - Bonds and Supplemental Memorandum of Understanding
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0012 /CH0083
Title
Capital Projects - Inclusion of Public Art
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0085 /CH0298
Title
Capital Debt Affordability Committee - Annual Estimate
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0126 (HB0101/CH0014)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2019, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2009, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, and 2018
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0158 (HB0332/CH0540)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0641 (HB0668)
Title
Public School Construction - Maryland Stadium Authority - Montgomery County and Other School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 (HB1131)
Title
Baltimore County - Maryland Stadium Authority - Public School Construction
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0851
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses, Mandatory Appropriation, and County Authority to Incur Indebtedness
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0986 (HB1370)
Title
Baltimore City - Public School Construction - Bonds and Supplemental Memorandum of Understanding
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1014 /CH0337 (HB1192/CH0336)
Title
Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0101 /CH0014 (SB0126) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2019, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2009, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, and 2018 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 14
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB0332 /CH0540 (SB0158) Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program Delegate McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB0668 (SB0641) Public School Construction - Maryland Stadium Authority - Montgomery County and Other School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1034 Education - Interagency Commission on School Construction - Reimbursement to Eligible Counties Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1131 (SB0758) Baltimore County - Maryland Stadium Authority - Public School Construction Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1192 /CH0336 (SB1014/CH0337) Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Appropriations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1352 /CH0148 University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Appropriations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1370 (SB0986) Baltimore City - Public School Construction - Bonds and Supplemental Memorandum of Understanding Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0012 /CH0083 Capital Projects - Inclusion of Public Art Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Finance
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0085 /CH0298 Capital Debt Affordability Committee - Annual Estimate Senator Kagan 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Budget and Taxation
1/17/2019 - 10:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0126 (HB0101/CH0014) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2019, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2009, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, and 2018 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
SB0158 (HB0332/CH0540) Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program Senator Guzzone 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0641 (HB0668) Public School Construction - Maryland Stadium Authority - Montgomery County and Other School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0758 (HB1131) Baltimore County - Maryland Stadium Authority - Public School Construction Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0851 Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses, Mandatory Appropriation, and County Authority to Incur Indebtedness Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0986 (HB1370) Baltimore City - Public School Construction - Bonds and Supplemental Memorandum of Understanding Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1014 /CH0337 (HB1192/CH0336) Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement Senator Patterson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM