Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Bail

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0153
Title
Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - Provisional
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0476 (SB0720)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Alien Defendants - Nullity of Bail Bonds
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 (SB0505/CH0487)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Cash Bail
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0786 /CH0639
Title
Juvenile Law - Task Force on Juvenile Court Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1109
Title
Criminal Procedure - Defendants Held on No Bail Status - Comprehensive Risk Assessment
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1259
Title
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0505 /CH0487 (HB0777)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Cash Bail
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0648
Title
Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction and Detention
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0720 (HB0476)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Alien Defendants - Nullity of Bail Bonds
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1069
Title
Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0153 Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - Provisional Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0476 (SB0720) Criminal Procedure - Alien Defendants - Nullity of Bail Bonds Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0777 (SB0505/CH0487) Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Cash Bail Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0786 /CH0639 Juvenile Law - Task Force on Juvenile Court Jurisdiction Delegate Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1109 Criminal Procedure - Defendants Held on No Bail Status - Comprehensive Risk Assessment Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1259 Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0505 /CH0487 (HB0777) Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Cash Bail Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0648 Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction and Detention Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0720 (HB0476) Criminal Procedure - Alien Defendants - Nullity of Bail Bonds Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1069 Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial Release Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM