Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Bail

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0031 (SB0412)
Title
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Minimum
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0120 /CH0402
Title
Criminal Procedure - Failure to Appear - Rescheduling
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0361
Title
Criminal Procedure - Government-Funded Legal Representation - Initial Appearance
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0397
Title
Commercial Bail Data Analysis
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0494
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496 (SB0942)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Government-Funded Legal Representation - Initial Appearance
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0530
Title
Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - Provisional
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0596
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program Corporation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0618 /CH0442 (SB0172)
Title
Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1001
Title
Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Return of Defendant
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1050
Title
Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Installment Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 (HB0618/CH0442)
Title
Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0412 (HB0031)
Title
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0942 (HB0496)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Government-Funded Legal Representation - Initial Appearance
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0031 (SB0412) Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0032 Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Minimum Delegate Schulz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0120 /CH0402 Criminal Procedure - Failure to Appear - Rescheduling Delegate Vallario 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0361 Criminal Procedure - Government-Funded Legal Representation - Initial Appearance Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judiciary
HB0397 Commercial Bail Data Analysis Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0494 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0496 (SB0942) Criminal Procedure - Government-Funded Legal Representation - Initial Appearance Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0530 Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - Provisional Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0596 Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program Corporation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0618 /CH0442 (SB0172) Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities Delegate Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1001 Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Return of Defendant Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1050 Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Installment Agreements Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0172 (HB0618/CH0442) Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities Senator Gladden 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0412 (HB0031) Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0942 (HB0496) Criminal Procedure - Government-Funded Legal Representation - Initial Appearance Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM