Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Bail

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0304 (SB0243)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589
Title
Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - Provisional
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0599 (SB0496)
Title
Poultry Litter Management Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0634 (SB0209)
Title
Juvenile Law - Adjudication of Delinquency - Collateral Consequences
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0678 (SB0470)
Title
Surety Insurance - Application for Bonds
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1202 (SB0971)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence - Appeal Right
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306
Title
Habitual Drunk Driver - Mandatory Minimum Penalty and Vehicle Forfeiture
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0123
Title
Interstate Boating Violator Compact
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0209 (HB0634)
Title
Juvenile Law - Adjudication of Delinquency - Collateral Consequences
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0243 (HB0304)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0402
Title
Criminal Law - First Degree Murder - Sentencing (Geraldine's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0463
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Expedited Eviction Proceedings - Notice and Appeals
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0470 (HB0678)
Title
Surety Insurance - Application for Bonds
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 (HB0599)
Title
Poultry Litter Management Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0971 (HB1202)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence - Appeal Right
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1156
Title
Criminal Procedure - Determination of Eligibility for Services - Office of the Public Defender
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0304 (SB0243) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0589 Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - Provisional Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0599 (SB0496) Poultry Litter Management Act Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0634 (SB0209) Juvenile Law - Adjudication of Delinquency - Collateral Consequences Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0678 (SB0470) Surety Insurance - Application for Bonds Delegate Branch 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Economic Matters
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1046 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1202 (SB0971) Criminal Procedure - Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence - Appeal Right Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1306 Habitual Drunk Driver - Mandatory Minimum Penalty and Vehicle Forfeiture Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0123 Interstate Boating Violator Compact Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0209 (HB0634) Juvenile Law - Adjudication of Delinquency - Collateral Consequences Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0243 (HB0304) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0402 Criminal Law - First Degree Murder - Sentencing (Geraldine's Law) Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0463 Landlord and Tenant - Expedited Eviction Proceedings - Notice and Appeals Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0470 (HB0678) Surety Insurance - Application for Bonds Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Reilly)
Finance
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0496 (HB0599) Poultry Litter Management Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0971 (HB1202) Criminal Procedure - Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence - Appeal Right Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB1156 Criminal Procedure - Determination of Eligibility for Services - Office of the Public Defender Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/11/2016 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM