Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Bail

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0451 /CH0186 (SB0375/CH0185)
Title
Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839
Title
Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - Provisional
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1157 (SB0879)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pilot Program and Conditions
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1215 (SB0983)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1218
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Financial Conditions
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1280
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Criteria
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1318
Title
Baltimore City - Nonviolent Offenders - Release Without Bail
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1390 (SB0880)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1494 (SB0459/CH0807)
Title
Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0081
Title
Interstate Boating Violator Compact
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0375 /CH0185 (HB0451/CH0186)
Title
Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0459 /CH0807 (HB1494)
Title
Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0714 /CH0606
Title
Criminal Procedure - Indigent Individual - Indigency Determination
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0879 (HB1157)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pilot Program and Conditions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0880 (HB1390)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Reform
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0983 (HB1215)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0451 /CH0186 (SB0375/CH0185) Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education Requirements Delegate Cluster 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Economic Matters
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0839 Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - Provisional Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1157 (SB0879) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pilot Program and Conditions Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1215 (SB0983) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1218 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Financial Conditions Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1280 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Criteria Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1318 Baltimore City - Nonviolent Offenders - Release Without Bail Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1390 (SB0880) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Reform Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1494 (SB0459/CH0807) Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Rules
SB0081 Interstate Boating Violator Compact Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0375 /CH0185 (HB0451/CH0186) Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education Requirements Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Finance
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0459 /CH0807 (HB1494) Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 807
Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0714 /CH0606 Criminal Procedure - Indigent Individual - Indigency Determination Senator McFadden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0879 (HB1157) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pilot Program and Conditions Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0880 (HB1390) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Reform Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0983 (HB1215) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM