Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Bail

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045 (SB0122)
Title
Economic Development - Opportunity Zone Incentives - Alteration of the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0401 (SB0758)
Title
Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1197
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0122 (HB0045)
Title
Economic Development - Opportunity Zone Incentives - Alteration of the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement Programs
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 (HB0401)
Title
Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0045 (SB0122) Economic Development - Opportunity Zone Incentives - Alteration of the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement Programs Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:15 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/28/2020 - 1:15 PM
HB0401 (SB0758) Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act) Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1197 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act) Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0122 (HB0045) Economic Development - Opportunity Zone Incentives - Alteration of the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement Programs Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/15/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0758 (HB0401) Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act) Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/7/2020 4:54 PM