Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ballots

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0025
Title
Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0384 (SB0290/CH0480)
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1094
Title
Election Law - Polling Places - Proof of Identity
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1327 (SB0582)
Title
Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed Districts
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1453 /CH0481 (SB1062)
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0290 /CH0480 (HB0384)
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0438 /CH0501
Title
Municipal Elections - Inclusion of Offices and Questions on the State Ballot
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0582 (HB1327)
Title
Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed Districts
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0636
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Method for Selection of Members (Listen to the People Act of 2014)
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0848
Title
Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Legislation Summary
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1062 (HB1453/CH0481)
Title
Education - Baltimore County School Board Nominating Commission
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0025 Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting Delegate George 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0384 (SB0290/CH0480) Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1094 Election Law - Polling Places - Proof of Identity Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1327 (SB0582) Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed Districts Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1453 /CH0481 (SB1062) Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481
Ways and Means
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0290 /CH0480 (HB0384) Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members Senator Brochin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0438 /CH0501 Municipal Elections - Inclusion of Offices and Questions on the State Ballot Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0582 (HB1327) Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed Districts Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0636 Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Method for Selection of Members (Listen to the People Act of 2014) Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0848 Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Legislation Summary Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1062 (HB1453/CH0481) Education - Baltimore County School Board Nominating Commission Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM