Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ballots

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0087 (SB0156)
Title
Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0143 /CH0107
Title
Elections - Miscellaneous Duties and Procedures
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0168
Title
Election Law - Required Notifications - Voter Challenges or Intimidation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0517 (SB0358)
Title
Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency Act
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532 (SB1133)
Title
Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0539
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0724
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Election
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056
Title
Election Law - Court Offices - Nonpartisan Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1382 /CH0439 (SB1121/CH0440)
Title
Election Law - Candidate for Circuit Court Judge Defeated in Primary Election
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1626 /CH0825
Title
Election Law - Early Voting - Registered Voter Updating the Voter's Address on an Existing Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0064
Title
Voter Registration - Affiliating With a Party
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0130 /CH0282
Title
Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign Principals
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0156 (HB0087)
Title
Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0358 (HB0517)
Title
Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency Act
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0406
Title
Election Law - Voting System - Digital Scanners
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0711
Title
Election Law - Elections by Mail
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0960
Title
Election Law - Reporting of Precinct Results
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1133 (HB0532)
Title
Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity
Sponsor
Senator Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0087 (SB0156) Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - Procedures Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2017 - 1:30 PM
HB0143 /CH0107 Elections - Miscellaneous Duties and Procedures Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Ways and Means
2/07/2017 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0168 Election Law - Required Notifications - Voter Challenges or Intimidation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2017 - 1:30 PM
HB0517 (SB0358) Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency Act Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0532 (SB1133) Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0539 Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0724 Circuit Court Judges - Election Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1056 Election Law - Court Offices - Nonpartisan Elections Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1382 /CH0439 (SB1121/CH0440) Election Law - Candidate for Circuit Court Judge Defeated in Primary Election Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Judicial Proceedings
HB1626 /CH0825 Election Law - Early Voting - Registered Voter Updating the Voter's Address on an Existing Registration Delegate Ali 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 825
Ways and Means
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0064 Voter Registration - Affiliating With a Party Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2017 - 2:15 PM
SB0130 /CH0282 Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign Principals Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0156 (HB0087) Baltimore County - Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Court - Procedures Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0358 (HB0517) Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency Act Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0406 Election Law - Voting System - Digital Scanners Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0711 Election Law - Elections by Mail Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0960 Election Law - Reporting of Precinct Results Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1133 (HB0532) Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity Senator Oaks 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM